Trice v. Eversole et al

Plaintiff: Ellis Trice
Defendant: Patti Bonewell and Donald Eversole
Case Number: 2:2011cv02073
Filed: April 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT as set forth in the 58 Report and Recommendation and 61 Order, plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 28, 2012. (rw)
February 16, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 41 in its entirety. Accordingly, separate Defendant Patti Bonewell's 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadingsis denied. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 16, 2012. (lw)
January 12, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the motion for Conclusion, 36 is denied however the document will be treated as a response to the motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by defendant Bonewell (Doc 30). Motion for extension of time is granted 37 , and Plaintiff is given until 2/21/2012 to submit his summary judgment motion. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 12, 2012. (sh)
April 28, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER finding that the interests of justice would best be served by transferring this case, the Clerk is hereby directed to immediately transfer this action to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Fort Smith Division. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/28/11. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 4/28/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trice v. Eversole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Bonewell
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Eversole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?