Tate v. Johnson County, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Joey Marlin Tate
Defendant: Jimmy Dorney, Johnson County, Arkansas and Robert Peterson
Case Number: 2:2011cv02092
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 79 Motion to Compel and DENYING 79 Motion to Subpeona, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 10, 2014. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas)
October 1, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 61 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Joey Marlin Tate; and DENYING 69 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Joey Marlin Tate. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 1, 2014. Copy of order mailed to non-CM/ECF participant. (jas) Modified text on 10/1/2014 (jas).
September 26, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with exceptions as set forth. Further, granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Judgment, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 26, 2012. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Johnson County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Dorney
Represented By: Robert L. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County, Arkansas
Represented By: Robert L. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Peterson
Represented By: Robert L. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Marlin Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?