Bank of America, N.A. v. Caruk Holdings Arkansas, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Caruk Holdings Arkansas, LLC, Denise L. Caruk and Gordon C. Caruk
Case Number: 2:2011cv02096
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED DECREE of Foreclosure in Rem in amount of $153,418.32. Interest from date of judgment to accrue at the legal rate of.15% per annum, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 11, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service).(lw)
June 28, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion to Modify Decree and Approve Agreement for Private Sale of Real Property. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 28, 2013. (lw)
March 28, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court DECREE of Foreclosure in Rem against the property, in amount of $153,418.32. Interest from date of judgment to accrue at the legal rate of.15% per annum. If judgment not paid within ten days, setting forth terms and conditions for judicial sale. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 28, 2013. (lw)
February 19, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Bank of America, N.A. against Denise L. Caruk, Gordon C. Caruk in the amount of $87,688.52, attorneys' fees and expenses in the amount of $65,729.80 and interest at the rate of.15% per annum until paid. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 19, 2013. (lw)
January 7, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Separate Defendants Gordon C. Caruk and Denise L. Caruk. Further that a hearing on the issue of attorneys' fees and costs will be conducted 1/28/2013 at 1:30 PM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 7, 2013. (lw)
December 5, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Reopen Case; Case reopened, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 5, 2012. (lw)
August 28, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment will be entered by the Court under separate order within (20) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 28, 2012. (lw)
August 2, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER re 30 Order, granting Plaintiff's 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Further that all parties cooperate fully in completing discovery by this date. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 2, 2012. (lw)
November 17, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, directing clerk to send a copy of this Order and copy of 22 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, which came back "Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 17, 2011. (lw)
August 11, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Defendants shall file their answer to the complaint within five days of this Order (answer due 8/18/11). 16 Clerk's Entry of Default as to the defendants is hereby set aside. Further 12 Motion for Default Judgment is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 11, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Caruk Holdings Arkansas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caruk Holdings Arkansas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise L. Caruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon C. Caruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Diana E. Borgognoni
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?