Miller v. Dugan et al

Plaintiff: John Edward Miller
Defendant: Kevin R. Dugan, Jerrod Wayne Scott and Barling, City of
Case Number: 2:2011cv02129
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Attorney Fees, in favor of John Edward Miller against City of Barling, Jerrod Wayne Scott and Kevin R. Dugan. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 26, 2013. (jas)
December 18, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK' ORDER/JUDGMENT in favor of John Edward Miller against Barling, City of, Jerrod Wayne Scott, John Edward Miller, Kevin R. Dugan jointly in the amount of $40,000.00 plus costs and attorneys fees. Signed on December 18, 2012. (sh)
December 14, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel, consistent with the rulings made by the court from the bench on 12/7/12. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 14, 2012. (lw)
May 24, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Compel. Further directing Plaintiff to file any Response to Defendant's Motion on or before 5/31/12. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 24, 2012. (lw)
December 5, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION re 10 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and For Production of PHI filed by Jerrod Wayne Scott, John Edward Miller, Kevin R. Dugan, Barling, City of. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 5, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Dugan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Edward Miller
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Capron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin R. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrod Wayne Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barling, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?