Fields v. Sebastian County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Wayne Fields
Defendant: Sebastian County Sheriff's Office and Randall Reed
Case Number: 2:2011cv02189
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 80 Report and Recommendations in its entirety. Accordingly, Defendants' 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 22, 2014. (lw)
November 7, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Compel and 63 Motion Production of medical records; ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO issue a subpoena by Certified Mail Return Requested to the Medical Records Custodian, Corizon Medical Records, Attention Lor ene Clairborne, ADC Administration Building, 6318 Princeton Pike Rd., Pine Bluff, AR 71602. The custodian of Records is directed to produce all records from 12/26/2012 to present as to Plaintiff Marcus Wayne Fields. These records should be delivered by December 2, 2013. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 7, 2013. (sh)
September 4, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety 40 , and granting Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 60 , and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 4, 2013. (sh)
June 28, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 As SET FORTH re Motion for Policy of the Sheriff's Department; Denying 56 Motion to Compel Freedom of Information Act and denying 57 Motion of Noncompliance. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 28, 2013. (sh)
December 26, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 re: Medical records, the Clerk is directed to issue a subpoena to the Medical Records Custodian, Crizon Medical Records, Attention Lorene Clairborne, ADC Admin. Bldg, 6318 Princeton Pike Rd., Pine Bluff , AR 71602 that requires production as set forth in this order. The Motions to Appoint Counsel 34 and 46 are denied and 35 is denied as moot. Motions [34 and 46 , to proceed in forma pauperis are denied. The motion to compel 36 is granted and Defendants are directed to provide Plaintiff with a copy of the Transcript by January 18, 2013 Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 26, 2012. (sh)
July 5, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 defendant's Motion for Leave to depose the Plaintiff.The District Court Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to the Deputy Warden, Arkansas Department of Correction, East Arkansas Regional Unit, P O Box 180, Brickey s, AR 72320-0180, and should be sent Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested. Plaintiff will be allowed to have his legal materials relating to this case in his possession during the deposition. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 5, 2012. (sh)
February 16, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2012. (sh)
January 18, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, the plaintiff is directed to complete a new application. The application does not contain the certification regarding his inmate account. The clerk is directed to send the plaintiff a blank IFP application, and plaintiff is given until February 3, 2012 to return the completed form to the court or pay the $350.00 filing fee. Failure to obey this order will result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 18, 2012. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Sebastian County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Wayne Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?