Gipson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Greg Gipson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2012cv02275
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AFFIRMING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER and Plaintiffs case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 6, 2014. (lw)
December 11, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 6 Report and Recommendations and 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. That in lieu of an objection, Plaintiff tendered the filing fee of $350.00. Further the court directs service on Social Security Admin istration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 11, 2012. (lw)
December 10, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Greg Gipson. Objections to R&R due by 12/27/2012. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 10, 2012. (rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Gipson
Represented By: Fred L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?