Wheeler v. Terga

Plaintiff: Haley Wheeler
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 2:2013cv02156
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 9, 2013. (jas)
November 15, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 15, 2013. (lw)
July 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Substitute Party. United States is substituted in place of Jose Terga. 5 Motion to set time for the United States to answer or otherwise respond is GRANTED. The United States is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 20, 2013. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 17, 2013. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Terga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Wheeler
Represented By: Bill D. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Deborah Fennell Groom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?