Lindsey v. Hollenbeck et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Lindsey
Defendant: William Hollenbeck, John Devane, Pam Carnell, Kathy Jones, John Miller, Cindy Moore and Cheryl Makinson
Case Number: 2:2013cv02192
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT; Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 31, 2017. (hnc)
May 7, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 33 Motion to Set Aside Service; denying 35 Motion for Order; and granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File ( Summary Judgment Motion due 6/4/2014). Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 7, 2014. (lw)
January 13, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 19 Order of the Magistrate denying Mr. Lindsey's motion 5 and 16 . Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 13, 2014. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. Hollenbeck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hollenbeck
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Devane
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Carnell
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Jones
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Miller
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Moore
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Makinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?