Raymond v. Shue et al

Petitioner: Leslie E. Raymond
Respondent: Linda Ward, John/Jane Doe, Dan Shue and Denora D. Coomer
Case Number: 2:2018cv02109
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Dan Shue, Linda Ward. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Rumpz, Pamela)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Denora D. Coomer re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus . (Davis, JaNan)
July 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Nicole Louks on behalf of Dan Shue, Linda Ward. (Louks, Ashley)
July 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Anne Rumpz on behalf of Dan Shue. (Rumpz, Pamela) Modified filer information on 7/17/2018 (mfr).
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Linda Ward received documents on 6/29/18. (lw)
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Dan Shue received documents on 6/29/18. (lw)
July 2, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Cindy Gilmer received documents on 6/30/18 for Denora D. Coomer. (lw)
June 27, 2018 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Linda Ward using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9260. (hnc)
June 27, 2018 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Dan Shue using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9590. (hnc)
June 27, 2018 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus as to Denora D. Coomer using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 9613. (hnc)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Dan Shue, Linda Ward, Denora Coomer (Circuit Court Clerk of Sebastian County, AR) and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 27, 2018. (hnc)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Petitioner. (lw)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus against John/Jane Doe(Sebastian County Deputy Court Clerk), John/Jane Doe(Sebastian County Court Clerk), Dan Shue, Linda Ward, filed by Leslie E. Raymond.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond v. Shue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leslie E. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Ward
Represented By: Pamela Anne Rumpz
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Louks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Shue
Represented By: Pamela Anne Rumpz
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Louks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Denora D. Coomer
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?