Titsworth v. Hodge et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Titsworth
Defendant: HealthChoice, Sparks Health System, Trevor Hodge, Patric Anderson, Sparks Regional Medical Center, HMA, LLC and Office of Management & Enterprise Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv02111
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to Counsel representing Defendant Trevor Hodge : The following attorney listed on the docket sheet is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: W. Michael Hill. An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to Local Rule 83.5 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures Manualfor Civil and Criminal Filings for further information. (lw)
July 5, 2018 Filing 90 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to parties. (lw)
July 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Answer Due deadline reset for Defendants Trevor Hodge and Patric Anderson; Answer due 7/17/2018. (lw)
July 5, 2018 Filing 89 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:17-cv-00350. Docket sheet received.
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White denying motions to dismiss ( #58 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; #60 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; #73 Motion to Dismiss) and granting motion to transfer case ( #73 Motion to Transfer Case) to the Western District of Arkansas (lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #86 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Dates AND resetting scheduling order dates as follows: Exhibit List due by 11/6/2018; Witness List due by 11/6/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2018; Discovery due by 12/5/2018; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 1/17/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White.(tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Dates by Patric Anderson Responses due by 7/5/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Defendants' Joint Motion for Protective Order and Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk is deemed MOOT, due to the agreement of counsel to postpone the deposition of Dr. Marouk until the requested medical records are received. (Re: #74 Motion for Protective Order; #74 Motion to Quash)(tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 84 SUPPLEMENT (Re: 83 Minute Order #74 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Joint MOTION to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk) by Patric Anderson, HMA, LLC, Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System Responses due by 6/7/2018(McNeer, Carrie) Modified on 5/25/2018 to term motion and edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing defendants supplement Defendants' Joint Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk and Brief in Support filed 4/25/2018 (Re: #74 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint MOTION to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk) as to the status of the document production and the date of the rescheduled deposition of Dr. Marouk no later than 5/25/2018.(lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #73 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or to Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss ) by HMA, LLC, Sparks Health System ;(Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #73 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or to Dismiss for Improper Venue MOTION to Dismiss ) by Kenneth Titsworth ;(Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Joint Application for Order Authorizing Release of Health Information ( #75 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief) (lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 79 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #74 Joint MOTION for Protective Order, Joint MOTION to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk) by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 78 Joint SUPPLEMENT (Re: 77 Minute Order, #75 Joint MOTION for Order Authorizing Release of Protected Health Information) by Patric Anderson, HMA, LLC, Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System (With attachments) Responses due by 5/15/2018(McNeer, Carrie) Modified docket entry text and terminated motion on 5/2/2018 (lal, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing defendants supplement Defendants' Joint Application for Order Authorizing Release of Protected Health Information and Brief in Support filed 4/26/2018 (Re: #75 Joint MOTION Defendants' Joint Application for Order Authorizing Release of Protected Health Information and Brief in Support ) to comply with Local Civil Rule 7.1(f). The motion does not reflect whether or not an informal conference was held between defendants' counsel and counsel for plaintiff pursuant to the rule and, more importantly, the motion fails to state what if any objection plaintiff may have to the requested relief. The title of defendants' motion mentions "joint" but no where in the body is an indication plaintiff joined in it or agrees with the request. The Court directs the supplement be filed AND a proposed order be submitted no later than 5/1/2018.(lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : The deposition of Dr. John Marouk previously scheduled for Monday, April 30, 2018 at 10:00 AM is hereby STAYED. Plaintiff is directed to file an EXPEDITED RESPONSE to Defendants' Joint Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk (Re: #74 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint MOTION to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk) no later than 5/1/2018.(lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Order Authorizing Release of Protected Health Information and Brief in Support by Patric Anderson, HMA, LLC, Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System Responses due by 5/10/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Joint MOTION to Quash Deposition of Dr. John Marouk by Patric Anderson, HMA, LLC, Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System (With attachments) Responses due by 5/9/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District or MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Sparks Health System Responses due by 5/4/2018(Main, Edward). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 4/24/2018 (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Mississippi HMA Holdings I, LLC (a privately held Delaware limited liability company), Corporate Parent Health Management Associates, LP (a privately held Delaware limited partnership), Corporate Parent HMA Hospital Holdings, LP (a privately held Delaware limited partnership), Corporate Parent Health Management General Partner, LLC (a privately held Delaware limited liability company), Corporate Parent Health Management Associates, LLC (a privately held Delaware limited liability company), Corporate Parent HMA-TRI Holdings, LLC (a privately held Delaware limited liability company), Corporate Parent CHS/Community Health Systems, Inc. (a privately held Delaware corporation), Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. (a publicly traded Delaware corporation) for HMA, LLC) by HMA, LLC (Perkinson, Tara) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 71 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #53 Amended Complaint) by HMA, LLC (Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 70 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward J. Main on behalf of HMA, LLC (Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 69 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Perkinson on behalf of HMA, LLC (Perkinson, Tara) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 68 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. Michael Hill on behalf of HMA, LLC (Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White denying Defendant Anderson's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss ( #66 Motion to Stay ) (lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Patric Anderson Responses due by 4/17/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Patric Anderson ;(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Trevor Hodge ;(Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 63 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to HMA, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Kenneth Titsworth ; (With attachments)(Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 61 Amended JOINT STATUS REPORT by Patric Anderson, Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System (McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 60 Special Appearance and Renewed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Trevor Hodge (With attachments) Responses due by 3/8/2018(Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #53 Amended Complaint) by Sparks Health System (Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Patric Anderson (With attachments) Responses due by 3/8/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 57 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to HMA, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Settlement Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Settlement Conference Statements due 9/18/2018. (tmb, Chambers) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White setting scheduling order date(s): Exhibit List due by 7/31/2018; Witness List due by 7/31/2018; Discovery due by 8/31/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2018; Agreed Jury Instructions & Trial Briefs due by 10/11/2018; Agreed Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 10/30/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing the parties to confer and file an Amended Joint Status Report no later than 3/02/2018. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 53 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint) by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 52 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 51 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System (Perkinson, Tara) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 50 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Patric Anderson (McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 49 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Patric Anderson, Trevor Hodge, Sparks Health System (McNeer, Carrie) Modified on 2/12/2018 to delete filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sparks Health System (Perkinson, Tara) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White GRANTING in part Plaintiff's #46 Motion to Amend Complaint AND directing Plaintiff to file his amended complaint no later than 2/9/2018. Additionally Defendants Office of Management & Enterprise Service's and Healthchoice's #17 Motion to Dismiss, Defendant Patric Anderson, M.D.'s #31 Motion to Dismiss, and Defendant Trevor Hodge M.D.'s #45 Motion to Dismiss Party are deemed MOOT. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION to Amend (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Kenneth Titsworth (With attachments) Responses due by 2/20/2018(Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 2, 2018 Filing 45 Special Appearance and MOTION to Dismiss Party Trevor Hodge, MD by Trevor Hodge (With attachments) Responses due by 2/16/2018(Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by Kenneth Titsworth ; (With attachments)(Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: granting #30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Sparks Regional Medical Center. (cjt, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #30 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Kenneth Titsworth ;(Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed 1/22/2018 ( #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ). Accordingly, defendant Trevor Hodge has until 2/6/2018 within which to file his answer or otherwise plead. (lal, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Plaintiff's #39 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Sparks Regional Medical Center's #30 Motion to Dismiss AND Defendant Patric Anderson's #31 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to Docket Entry #30 due by 1/31/2018 AND Plaintiff's Response to Docket Entry #31 due by 2/1/2018. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #30 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Kenneth Titsworth Responses due by 2/6/2018(Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 38 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward J. Main on behalf of Trevor Hodge (Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 37 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Perkinson on behalf of Trevor Hodge (Perkinson, Tara) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 36 AMENDED ANSWER (Re: #28 Answer to Amended Complaint, #9 Amended Complaint ) by Sparks Health System (Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Trevor Hodge Responses due by 2/5/2018(Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. Michael Hill on behalf of Trevor Hodge (Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 2/9/2018. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-17-350-RAW. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set 1/18/2018 at 2:15 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, and all associated deadlines, are hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Patric Anderson (With attachments) Responses due by 1/26/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 11, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Sparks Regional Medical Center (With attachments) Responses due by 1/25/2018(Main, Edward) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 11, 2018 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward J. Main on behalf of Sparks Regional Medical Center and Sparks Health System (Main, Edward) Modified on 1/12/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #9 Amended Complaint) by Sparks Health System (Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Dismissal, dismissing Office of Management & Enterrprise Services and HealthChoice, dismissing plaintiff's claims 1, 2 and 4, (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) Modified to correct text on 1/9/2018 (adw, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - This Court acknowledges the random assignment of this case. By separate electronic mail transmission from the Clerk of this Court, the parties have been provided the Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge With Consent to Proceed or District Judge Option form for completion and submission. If you have not received a copy of the Notice from the Clerk, a copy may be obtained on this District's website at www.oked.uscourts.gov under the tab for Forms and is titled Consent or District Judge Option Form. The parties shall submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form by JANUARY 15, 2018.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 8, 2018 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Perkinson on behalf of Sparks Health System, Sparks Regional Medical Center (Perkinson, Tara) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant Patrick Anderson, M.D.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Docket Entry #23 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant Anderson shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by JANUARY 15, 2018.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Patric Anderson Responses due by 1/18/2018(McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carrie B. McNeer on behalf of Patric Anderson (McNeer, Carrie) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 4, 2018 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean H. McKee on behalf of Patric Anderson (McKee, Sean) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Sparks Health System and Sparks Regional Medical Center (Docket Entry #19 ) is hereby GRANTED. The moving Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by JANUARY 11, 2018.(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 28, 2017 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #9 Amended Complaint ) by Sparks Health System, Sparks Regional Medical Center Responses due by 1/11/2018(Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 28, 2017 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. Michael Hill on behalf of Sparks Health System, Sparks Regional Medical Center (Hill, W.) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party by HealthChoice, Office of Management & Enterprise Services Responses due by 1/5/2018(McClure, Kevin) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin L. McClure on behalf of HealthChoice, Office of Management & Enterprise Services (McClure, Kevin) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sparks Health System - Served on 12/6/2017. by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Office of Management & Enterprise Services - Served on 12/1/2017. by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sparks Regional Medical Center - Served on 12/6/2017. by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 1/18/2017 02:15 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2018. (adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to HealthChoice (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Office of Management & Enterprise Services (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kenneth Titsworth (Hightower, Steven) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/21/2017 at 1:45 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sparks Regional Medical Center (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sparks Health System (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patric Anderson (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Trevor Hodge (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/20/2017 in the amount of $400, receipt number 14362 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Kenneth Titsworth (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 9/27/2017) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Kenneth Titsworth (With attachment) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]
September 20, 2017 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kenneth Titsworth (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 7/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titsworth v. Hodge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthChoice
Represented By: Kevin L. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks Health System
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Edward J. Main
Represented By: Tara Perkinson
Represented By: Timothy L. Boone
Represented By: Edward John Main
Represented By: Sarah E. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Hodge
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Edward J. Main
Represented By: Tara Perkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patric Anderson
Represented By: Carrie B. McNeer
Represented By: Sean H. McKee
Represented By: Michelle L. Browning
Represented By: Graham C. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sparks Regional Medical Center
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Edward J. Main
Represented By: Tara Perkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMA, LLC
Represented By: W. Michael Hill
Represented By: Edward J. Main
Represented By: Tara Perkinson
Represented By: Timothy L. Boone
Represented By: Edward John Main
Represented By: Sarah E. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management & Enterprise Services
Represented By: Kevin L. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Titsworth
Represented By: Steven M. Hightower
Represented By: Steven Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?