Spence v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Randall S. Spence
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2018cv02137
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
2 Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Randall S. Spence Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Attorney General (Duty, Davis)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Randall S. Spence Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to General Counsel (Duty, Davis)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Randall S. Spence. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Duty, Davis)
September 6, 2018 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
August 7, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes, III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (lw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Randall S. Spence. (Duty, Davis)
August 6, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1755434.. (Duty, Davis)
August 6, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/8/2018 (lw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Reassignment Form)(lw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Randall S. Spence. (lw)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Randall S. Spence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spence v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall S. Spence
Represented By: Davis Duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?