The Kansas City Southern Railway Company v. Beaty
Plaintiff: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Defendant: Jerry L. Beaty
Case Number: 2:2018cv02201
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/8/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 2, 2019. (jas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. Jerry L. Beaty served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Norton, C.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jerry L. Beaty.(Sallings, Jerry)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Jon Sallings on behalf of Jerry L. Beaty. (Sallings, Jerry)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jerry L. Beaty and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
November 30, 2018 Complaint fee received: $400.00, receipt number 2020977. (hnc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rex M. Terry on behalf of The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Terry, Rex)
November 29, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Rex M. Terry. (mjm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
November 29, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/3/2018. (mjm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (mjm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry L. Beaty, filed by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company v. Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L. Beaty
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: C. Ryan Norton
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?