Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC v. Villines et al
Plaintiff: Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC
Defendant: Justin James Villines, Sherman Villines, Lester D. Davidson, Jason Bo Villines and Utah Sherman Villines
Case Number: 2:2018cv02202
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sherman Villines.(hnc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lester D. Davidson.(hnc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason Bo Villines.(hnc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Justin James Villines.(hnc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 25 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2019. Bench Trial set for 11/18/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 17, 2019. (jas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Utah Sherman Villines.(Woods, Rick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Absent compelling circumstances, settlement negotiations are not good cause for an extension of time. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 15, 2019. (rab)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Utah Sherman Villines. (Woods, Rick)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' deadlines to answer or respond to the complaint are extended to January 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 18, 2018. (rab)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sherman Villines. (lw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Justin James Villines. (lw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jason Bo Villines. (lw) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit text (lw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Lester D. Davidson. (lw) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit text (lw).
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Separate Defendant Utah Sherman Villines's deadline to answer or respond to the complaint is January 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 17, 2018. (rab)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Utah Sherman Villines. (Woods, Rick)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #13 Motion for Protective Order. Rule 26(c) protective orders may be requested by "[a] party or any person from whom discovery is sought." The movant must show good cause for entry of the order, which requires at a minimum "a particular and specific demonstration of fact, as distinguished from stereotyped and conclusory statements." Gen. Dynamics Corp. v. Selb Mfg. Co., 481 F.2d 1204, 1212 (8th Cir. 1973) (quoting Wright & Miller, Federal Practice and Procedure: Civil 2035 at 264-65). Plaintiff is not yet a party from whom discovery is sought, and the good cause set out in its motion is largely speculative. This order does not preclude a recipient of any subpoena served by Plaintiff from seeking a protective order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 11, 2018. (rab)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER granting #9 Motion for Discovery. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 10, 2018. (mjm) Modified on 12/10/2018 to edit text (mjm).
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lester D. Davidson, Jason Bo Villines, Justin James Villines, Sherman Villines, Utah Sherman Villines and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION for Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information in Possession of Third Parties by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information in Possession of Third Parties by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Utah Serman Villines for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Sherman Villines for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lester D. Davidson for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Justin James Villines for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jason Bo Villines for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1829087.. (Baker, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
December 4, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/6/2018. (mjm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC. (mjm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lester D. Davidson, Jason Bo Villines, Justin James Villines, Sherman Villines, Utah Sherman Villines, filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC v. Villines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin James Villines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Villines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bo Villines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Sherman Villines
Represented By: Rick Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?