Teague v. Georgia Pacific

Plaintiff: Jimmy Teague
Defendant: Georgia Pacific
Case Number: 2:2019cv02022
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Teague's claims for retaliation under Title VII and the ADEA, hostile work environment under Title VII and the ADEA, and discrimination and retaliation under the Arkansas Civil Rights Act are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 1, 2019. (mjm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint filed by Jimmy Teague. (Allison, Derick)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Pacific. (Shin, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Allison, Derick)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint by Georgia Pacific. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination)(Shin, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint by Georgia Pacific. (Shin, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER striking 5 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Defendant is directed to re-file its motion to dismiss and its brief in support as separate documents in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 18, 2019. (cds)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Shin on behalf of Georgia Pacific. (Shin, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/25/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 18, 2019. (jas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Georgia Pacific.(Calkins, Audrey)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 ***STRICKEN per 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER*** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II, III, and IV of the Complaint by Georgia Pacific. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge)(Calkins, Audrey) Modified on 3/19/2019 to add text and break link (mjm).
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Georgia Pacific and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
February 5, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1861466.. (Allison, Derick)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(hnc)
February 4, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/6/2019 (hnc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jimmy Teague. (hnc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Georgia Pacific, filed by Jimmy Teague.(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. Georgia Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Teague
Represented By: Derick A. J. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific
Represented By: Audrey Calkins
Represented By: Gregory Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?