Havens et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sherry McDonald and Bonnie S. Havens
Defendant: Shelter Insurance Companies, Shelter General Insurance Company and Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02025
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 18, 2019. (jas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Bingaman, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Party. Claims against Defendants Shelter General Insurance Company and Shelter Insurance Companies are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 12, 2019. (rab)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss Party by Bonnie S. Havens, Sherry McDonald. (Weimar, Deeanna)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 11, 2019. (jas)
February 11, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1865628.. (Bingaman, James)
February 8, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Complaint #2 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Deeanna Weimar. An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (hnc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Insurance Companies, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Originally filed on 2/7/19 in Logan County Circuit Court (hnc) Modified on 2/8/2019 to add text (hnc). Modified on 2/11/2019 to edit text (mjm).
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Insurance Companies, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (hnc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Insurance Companies, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Bonnie S. Havens, Sherry McDonald. Originally filed in Logan County Circuit Court. (hnc)
February 8, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/11/2019 (hnc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Logan County Circuit Court, case number 42PCV-19-7., filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(hnc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed in Logan County Circuit Court) (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havens et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Insurance Companies
Represented By: James H Bingaman
Represented By: Jerry L. Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: James H Bingaman
Represented By: Jerry L. Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James H Bingaman
Represented By: Jerry L. Lovelace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry McDonald
Represented By: Deeana Weimar
Represented By: Deeanna Weimar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie S. Havens
Represented By: Deeana Weimar
Represented By: Deeanna Weimar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?