Edwards v. Stevens
Petitioner: Teddy Edwards
Respondent: Sheriff Jimmy Stevens
Case Number: 2:2019cv02030
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
2 Judge: James R Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked No longer here, transported to ADC. Mail originally sent to Teddy Edwards at Johnson County Jail including #9 Order #10 Response filed by Teddy Edwards. No new address available. (hnc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Teddy Edwards re #7 Correspondence from Court. (hnc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Teddy Edwards. The Motion to Dismiss #7 is GRANTED and the Petition is Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 6, 2019. (mjm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Office of Attorney General (on behalf of Leslie Rutledge) received documents on 2/19/19 per USPS website. (hnc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Teddy Edwards asking to Dismiss Case. (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Court Response to Letter mailed to Plaintiff on 2/26/19) (hnc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jimmy Stevens.(hnc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #4 Order directing Service. J. Shannon Holman received documents on 2/15/19 for Jimmy Stevens, Answer due 3/8/19.(hnc) Modified on 2/21/2019 to add answer due date (hnc).
February 13, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form as to Jimmy Stevens using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 00016868 9798 and Leslie Rutledge, Office of the Attorney General using 7013 2630 0001 6868 9781. (hnc)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Further DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Jimmy Stevens and the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas and granting 21 days to answer. This case is filed nunc pro tunc as of 2/6/19. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 13, 2019. (hnc) Modified on 2/14/2019 to edit text (mjm).
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(hnc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teddy Edwards. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(hnc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/14/2019) (mjm).
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Teddy Edwards, filed nunc pro tunc as of 2/6/19.(hnc) Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit filing date (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teddy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Jimmy Stevens
Represented By: Bruce R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?