Watts et al v. Watts et al
Plaintiff: Lindsay Lopez and Edward Allan Watts
Defendant: Daniel Shue, Sydney Ann Watts, Kristopher Koelemay, Dr. Brad Sheriff, British Broadcasting Corporation, Unkown FBI Employees, Dr. David L. Stevens, Dr. Lee Krehbiel, Beverly McClendon, Stuart Neil Watts, Donald Bobbitt, Fort Smith, City of, Jacqueline Hopkins, Dr. Paul Beran, Unknown Employees of the Western District of Arkansas US Attorney's Office, Barnes & Noble Inc., Leslie Rutledge, Dr. Christopher Barrick, News Corporation, Jarrard Copeland, Houston Garner, Unkown Department of Justice Educational Opportunities Section Associates, Dr. Ragar H. Moore, II, Western Arkansas Counseling Guidance, Walmart Stores Inc., Brian Lee Watts, Wayne Womack, Fox Corporation, Unknown FBI Employees, Unknown Department of Justice Educational Opportunities Section Associates and Unknown Co-Conspirators
Case Number: 2:2019cv02066
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #15 Notice of Appeal. (hnc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER of USCA requesting any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER be submitted within 10 days. Documents to be sent include Flash Drive exhibit as to #10 Amended Complaint. (hnc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of USCA re filing fee as to #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Allan Watts, Lindsay Lopez (hnc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 USCA Case Number 19-2455, 8th Circuit Court of Appeals for #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Allan Watts, Lindsay Lopez. (hnc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Allan Watts, Lindsay Lopez. (hnc)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting in their entirety #18 Report and Recommendations. Further, denying #16 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ; denying #17 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 9, 2019. (mjm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 9, 2019. (mjm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. (lw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Lindsay Lopez, #17 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Edward Allan Watts. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 19, 2019. (lw)
June 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Lindsay Lopez, #17 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Edward Allan Watts. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(lw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Edward Allan Watts. (lw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Lindsay Lopez. (lw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Judgment by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. ( via hand delivery: Edward Allan Watts and Lindsay Lopez.) (lw) (Additional attachments added from flash drive on 6/19/2019: #1 Action I, #2 Action II, #3 Action III, #4 Analysis, #5 Background) (lw). (Audio available on flash drive) Modified on 6/19/2019 to add text (lw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT, this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to #13 OPINION AND ORDER entered on this date. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 14, 2019. (mjm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Further denying as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #6 Motion for Service; Denying as moot #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #7 Motion for Service. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 14, 2019. (mjm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party, British Broadcasting Corporation, by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. (mjm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff's Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts to #10 Amended Complaint. (mjm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #2 Complaint, against Ragar H. Moore, II, Unknown Employees of the Western District of Arkansas US Attorney's Office, Unknown Co-Conspirators, Jarrard Copeland, Western Arkansas Counseling Guidance, Paul Beran, Walmart Stores Inc., Donald Bobbitt, Brad Sheriff, Lee Krehbiel, Barnes & Noble Inc., Unknown FBI Employees, Fort Smith, City of, News Corporation, Unknown Department of Justice Educational Opportunities Section Associates, Sydney Ann Watts, Daniel Shue, Christopher Barrick, David L. Stevens, Jacqueline Hopkins, Beverly McClendon, Wayne Womack, Kristopher Koelemay, Stuart Neil Watts, British Broadcasting Corporation, Leslie Rutledge, Houston Garner, Brian Lee Watts, filed by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Flash Drive stored in Clerk's Office) Related document: #2 Complaint, filed by Edward Allan Watts, Lindsay Lopez.(mjm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. (mjm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION requesting that no action be taken until Plaintiff files supplemental information by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. (hnc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Lindsay Lopez. (Per chambers do not refer motion to Magistrate Judge) (mjm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Edward Allan Watts. (Per chambers do not refer motion to Magistrate Judge) (mjm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 ***DISREGARD, Refiled - See Document #7 *** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lindsay Lopez. (mjm) Modified on 5/29/2019 to disregard (mjm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 ***DISREGARD, Refiled - See Document #6 *** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Allan Watts. (mjm) Modified on 5/29/2019 to disregard (mjm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Barnes & Noble Inc., Christopher Barrick, Paul Beran, Donald Bobbitt, British Broadcasting Corporation, Jarrard Copeland, Fort Smith, City of, Houston Garner, Jacqueline Hopkins, Kristopher Koelemay, Lee Krehbiel, Beverly McClendon, Ragar H. Moore, II, News Corporation, Leslie Rutledge, Brad Sheriff, Daniel Shue, David L. Stevens, Unknown Employees of the Western District of Arkansas US Attorney's Office, Unkown Department of Justice Educational Opportunities Section Associates, Unkown FBI Employees, Walmart Stores Inc., Brian Lee Watts, Stuart Neil Watts, Sydney Ann Watts, Western Arkansas Counseling Guidance, filed by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts.(mjm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lindsay Lopez, Edward Allan Watts. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts et al v. Watts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Shue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Ann Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Koelemay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Brad Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Broadcasting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown FBI Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David L. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee Krehbiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Neil Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Paul Beran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees of the Western District of Arkansas US Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Christopher Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrard Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown Department of Justice Educational Opportunities Section Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ragar H. Moore, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Arkansas Counseling Guidance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lee Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown FBI Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Department of Justice Educational Opportunities Section Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Co-Conspirators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Allan Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?