Caballero v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Kathy Caballero
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv02071
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Caballero. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Signed Green Card Elser, #2 Stmnt w Respect to Svc SSA Commissioner, #3 Signed Green Card SSA Commissioner, #4 Stmnt w Respect to Svc US Attorney General, #5 Signed Green Card US Attorney General)(Caddell, Fred)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kathy Caballero Statement with Respect to Service (Attachments: #1 Signed Green Card Elser, #2 Stmnt w Respect to Svc SSA Commissioner, #3 Signed Green Card SSA Commissioner, #4 Stmnt w Respect to Svc US Attorney General, #5 Signed Green Card US Attorney General)(Caddell, Fred)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Caballero, Kathy for service of the following document: 6 Order on Motion for Service,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons SS Commissioner)(Caddell, Fred)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 17, 2019. (cla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Kathy Caballero. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Caddell, Fred)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kathy Caballero. (Caddell, Fred)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
June 14, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/17/2019 (lw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Kathy Caballero.(Caddell, Fred)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Kathy Caballero. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Caballero
Represented By: Fred L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?