Beegle v. Inverness et al
Plaintiff: Betty Beegle
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Unknown Heirs, Administrators and Assigns of Patty Inverness and Patty Inverness
Case Number: 2:2019cv02093
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion for Order that Plaintiff and Defendant may Receive Vital Records of Patty Inverness from Arizona Department of Health Services. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 9, 2019. (mjm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Order to Receive Vital Records of Patty Inverness from Arizona Department of Health Services by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter from Arizona Dept of Health Services re Subpoena for birth records, #2 proposed Order Granting Access to Vital Records of Patty Inverness from Arizona Department of Health Services)(King, Andrew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (King, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (King, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/30/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 1, 2019. (slc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(King, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1949055.. (King, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (hnc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
July 19, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/22/2019 (hnc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (hnc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Patty Inverness, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Unknown Heirs, Administrators and Assigns of Patty Inverness, filed by Betty Beegle. Originally filed in Polk County Circuit Court on 6/14/19.(hnc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County Circuit Court, case number 57CV-19-59., filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Pleadings)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beegle v. Inverness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, Administrators and Assigns of Patty Inverness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Inverness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Beegle
Represented By: John David Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?