Pyles et al v. Land Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberlie Pyles and Kaylie Pyles
Defendant: Nematilla Isropilov, Interland, Inc., Land Lines, Inc. and Nemo Trucking Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02096
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 16, 2019. (jas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Interland, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint and Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Land Lines, Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Allison, Derick)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 7, 2019. (jas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Interland, Inc..(Cox, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Cox on behalf of Interland, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Cox on behalf of Interland, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint and Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Interland, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Allison, Derick)
July 30, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1954128.. (Cox, Robert)
July 29, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiffs Kaylie Pyles, Kimberlie Pyles to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court for Amended Complaint) for defendant(s) who have already been served with summons and a copy of the Amended Complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant(s) to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the Amended Complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) (hnc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(hnc)
July 26, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/29/2019 (hnc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Interland, Inc.. (hnc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Interland, Inc., Land Lines, Inc., Nematilla Isropilov, Nemo Trucking Company, Inc., filed by Kimberlie Pyles, Kaylie Pyles. Originally filed in Sebastian County Circuit Court on 7/3/19.(hnc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, case number CV-2019-104-G(V)., filed by Interland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Amended State Court Complaint)(hnc) Modified on 7/26/2019 to edit file date (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pyles et al v. Land Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nematilla Isropilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interland, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nemo Trucking Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlie Pyles
Represented By: Derick A. J. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylie Pyles
Represented By: Derick A. J. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?