Lunsford v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Heath Lunsford
Defendant: Mercdes Anderson, Sean McNevin and Shane Davis
Case Number: 2:2019cv02126
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
October 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Heath Lunsford. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(lw)
October 2, 2019 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas. (lw)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00681. Docket sheet received.
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer the entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. The #1 pending motion to proceed in forma pauperis is left to the Western District. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/1/2019. (jbh) [Transferred from ared on 10/2/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Heath Lunsford. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 10/2/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heath Lunsford. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 10/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lunsford v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercdes Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McNevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?