Bearden v. Brown & Root Contractors et al
Plaintiff: Jodi Bearden
Defendant: BR Industrial Operations, LLC, John Does 1-2, Kellogg Brown & Root, LLC, John Doe I, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Brown & Root Contractors, Brown & Root Industrial Services, LLC, Albemarle Corporation and Greg Nelson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02140
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jodi Bearden. Albemarle Corporation served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Albemarle Corporation, Brown & Root Industrial Services, LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, LLC, Greg Nelson and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/30/2019) (mjm).
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to GREG NELSON for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint,. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC. for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint,. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT LLC for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint,. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to BROWN & ROOT INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, LLC for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint,. (Gillham, Lucien)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Albemarle Corporation for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #6 Amended Complaint,. (Gillham, Lucien)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Greg Nelson, Kellogg Brown & Root, LLC, John Doe I, Brown & Root Contractors, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., BR Industrial Operations, LLC, Albemarle Corporation, Brown & Root Industrial Services, LLC, filed by Jodi Bearden.(lw)
November 19, 2019 Complaint fee received via PAY.GOV: $ 400.00, receipt number AARWDC-2018700. (mfr)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kellogg Brown & Root, LLC, John Doe I, Brown & Root Contractors, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., BR Industrial Operations, LLC, Albemarle Corporation, Brown & Root Industrial Services, LLC, filed by Jodi Bearden.(lw)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff's Counsel re John Doe filed by Jodi Bearden. (hnc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jodi Bearden. (hnc)
November 19, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/21/2019 (hnc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Albemarle Corporation, Brown & Root Contractors, Brown & Root Industrial Services, LLC, John Does 1-2, Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root, LLC, filed by Jodi Bearden.(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bearden v. Brown & Root Contractors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BR Industrial Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Root Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Root Industrial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albemarle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Bearden
Represented By: Lucien Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?