amGUARD Insurance Company v. JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: amGUARD Insurance Company
Defendant: Angela McHalffey, Zachariah Archer, Michael McHalffey, JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC and Emilio Z. Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv02146
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Angela McHalffey, Michael McHalffey.(Niswanger, Stephen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC's answer is due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 3, 2020. (jas)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC. (Witt, Ernest)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by amGUARD Insurance Company. Michael McHalffey served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Sanders, Roy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by amGUARD Insurance Company. Angela McHalffey served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Sanders, Roy) Modified on 12/20/2019 to correct service and answer due dates (mjm).
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by amGUARD Insurance Company. JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Sanders, Roy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by amGUARD Insurance Company. Emilio Z. Smith served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Sanders, Roy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Zachariah Archer, JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC, Angela McHalffey, Michael McHalffey, Emilio Z. Smith and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
November 26, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2024369.. (Sanders, Roy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by amGUARD Insurance Company. (hnc)
November 25, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/27/2019 (hnc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against Zachariah Archer, JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC, Angela McHalffey, Michael McHalffey, Emilio Z. Smith, filed by amGUARD Insurance Company.(hnc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (mjm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: amGUARD Insurance Company v. JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela McHalffey
Represented By: Stephen B. Niswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachariah Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McHalffey
Represented By: Stephen B. Niswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLW Towing & Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Ernest Wayne Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: amGUARD Insurance Company
Represented By: Roy Gene Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?