Howes v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Brayden L. Howes
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv02148
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
2 Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service, filed by Brayden L. Howes. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit USPS Green Card, #2 Affidavit USPS Green Card, #3 Appendix USPS Green Card)(McKinnon, Laura) Modified on 1/8/2020 to edit date served and answer due date(lw).
December 16, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
December 12, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (lw)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Andrew Saul, William Barr, US Attorney for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (McKinnon, Laura)
November 26, 2019 Complaint fee received: $400.00, receipt number 2021998. (mjm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Brayden L. Howes.(McKinnon, Laura)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Brayden L. Howes. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howes v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayden L. Howes
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?