Irwin v. Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Irwin
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Employee Services, LLC, Emeritus Corporation, ESC Management Company, Brookdale Fort Smith, Brookdale Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. and Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02150
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion to Stay. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE THE CASE, and the parties may move to reopen it if further action of the Court is required after arbitration has been completed. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 15, 2020. (lgd)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC, Brookdale Fort Smith, Brookdale Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., ESC Management Company, Emeritus Corporation, Employee Services, LLC. (Madison, Eva)
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Benson on behalf of Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC, Brookdale Fort Smith, Brookdale Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., ESC Management Company, Emeritus Corporation, Employee Services, LLC. (Benson, Margaret)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. The answer or other responsive pleading is now due on January 16, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 2, 2020. (ee)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,, by Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC, Brookdale Fort Smith, Brookdale Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., ESC Management Company, Emeritus Corporation, Employee Services, LLC. (Madison, Eva)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Employee Services, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Brookdale Fort Smith served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. ESC Management Company served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Emeritus Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Brookdale Living Communities, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lisa Irwin. Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC, Brookdale Fort Smith, Brookdale Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., ESC Management Company, Emeritus Corporation, Employee Services, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.; Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.; Brookdale Living Communities, Inc.; Emeritus Corporation; ESC Management Company d/b/a Brookdale Fort Smith; Brookdale Fort Smith; Brookdale Employee Services, LLC and Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, Memo of Reassignment, #1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Hattabaugh, Rebecca)
December 4, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to the case. (lw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC, Brookdale Fort Smith, Brookdale Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., ESC Management Company, Emeritus Corporation, Employee Services, LLC ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 2022015), filed by Lisa Irwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Job Description, #2 Exhibit B: Doctor's Note, #3 Exhibit C: Dismissal and Notice of Rights/Notice of Suit Rights from EEOC)(mjm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lisa Irwin. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irwin v. Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Services, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emeritus Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESC Management Company
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Fort Smith
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Living Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Employee Services-Corporate, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Irwin
Represented By: Rebecca Dawn Hattabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?