Mason, et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC and Nathan Mason
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and BFF, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02022
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 Letter to Sebastian County Circuit Court Clerk. (lw)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand and this matter is remanded to the Circuit Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 11, 2020. (lw)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Nathan Mason, Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC re #14 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Milligan, Phillip)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Vo, Caley)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 3/11/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 9, 2020. (lw)
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Vo, Caley)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint, filed by Nathan Mason, Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. BFF, LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1")(Milligan, Phillip)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Nathan Mason, Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Milligan, Phillip)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to BFF, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Complaint against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, BFF, LLC, filed by Nathan Mason, Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Nathan Mason, Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Insurance Policy)(hnc)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Vo, Caley)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Doty on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Doty, Dustin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 20, 2020. (jas)
February 20, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2083736.. (Vo, Caley)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
February 20, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/24/2020. (mjm)
February 19, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Notice of Removal #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Dustin K. Doty. (mjm)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas on 2/19/20 in case CV-2020-57)(mjm)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Nathan Mason, Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas 1/15/20 case CV-2020-57) (mjm)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas, case number CV-2020-57., filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(mjm) Modified on 2/20/2020 to correct filing date (mjm).
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason, et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Caley B. Vo
Represented By: Dustin Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFF, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Mason
Represented By: Phillip J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?