Crain v. In Villas Veritas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Crain
Defendant: Laura V. Blair and In Villas Veritas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02049
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #8 & #9 Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, denying #11 Motion for Default Judgment, denying #14 Motion to Remand and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 29, 2020. (tg)
May 29, 2020 Filing 31 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 5/29/2020. (Paula Barden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc)
May 28, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida by Shirley Crain. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 27, 2020 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #20 Motion to Strike. The Court agrees with Plaintiff that Defendants should have sought prior leave of Court to file their reply #19 to Plaintiff's response to the pending motions to dismiss, as Local Rule 7.2 only provides for a reply of right to be filed as to summary judgment motions. Nevertheless, at this point the Defendants have requested leave to file the reply, and the Court finds that belated leave should be granted. The reply is helpful to the Court's understanding of the issues, and Plaintiff will not suffer prejudice if the Court considers the reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 27, 2020. (ee)
May 22, 2020 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #18 Motion. This document is not a motion; it is purportedly a reaffirmation of Defendant Laura Victoria Blair's consent to the removal of this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 22, 2020. (ee)
May 22, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Document Production)(Marshall, Hollingsworth)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to STRIKE #25 Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney filed by Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC. Initial disclosures are not to be filed of record in this Court. See https://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/sites/arwd/files/forms/GuidelinesforDiscovery.pdf. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 22, 2020. (ee)
May 21, 2020 Filing 25 ***STRICKEN PER 26 ORDER***Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit In Villas Veritas Document Production)(Marshall, Hollingsworth) Modified on 5/26/20 to add text (lw).
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shirley Crain. (Moll, Mark)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Strike #19 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Filed by Plaintiff filed by In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #20 MOTION to Strike #19 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by Shirley Crain. (Person, J. Dalton)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #19 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by Shirley Crain. (Person, J. Dalton)
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Reaffirmation of Consent to Notice of Removal by In Villas Veritas filed by Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Reaffirmation of Consent to Notice of Removal by In Villas Veritas by Laura V. Blair. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Laura Victoria Blair , Re-Filed and Renewed, filed by Laura V. Blair. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Shirley Crain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Shirley Crain)(Person, J. Dalton)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Remand by Shirley Crain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Person, J. Dalton)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Shirley Crain. (Person, J. Dalton)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shirley Crain. (Person, J. Dalton)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 5/29/2020 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 9, 2020. (slc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Laura Victoria Blair , Re-Filed and Renewed, by Shirley Crain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File-Marked Motion for Default Judgment, Affidavit, and Brief in Support)(Person, J. Dalton)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Laura V. Blair. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Default)(lw)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons, filed by Shirley Crain. In Villas Veritas, LLC served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Moll, Mark)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons, filed by Shirley Crain. Laura V. Blair served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Moll, Mark)
April 3, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiff Shirley Crain to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for LAURA V. BLAIR who has already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) (lw)
April 3, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #3 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2115082.. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
April 2, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (hnc)
April 2, 2020 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
April 2, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/6/2020 (hnc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Laura V. Blair, In Villas Veritas, LLC, filed by Shirley Crain. Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County on 2/13/20.(hnc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by In Villas Veritas, LLC. (hnc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sebastian County Circuit Court, case number CV-2020-178., filed by In Villas Veritas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings, #2 Notice of removal filed in state court)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crain v. In Villas Veritas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Crain
Represented By: Mark A. Moll
Represented By: J. Dalton Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura V. Blair
Represented By: Hollingsworth Barret Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In Villas Veritas, LLC
Represented By: Hollingsworth Barret Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?