Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC v. Happy Trailer Sales, LLC
Plaintiff: Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC
Defendant: Happy Trailer Sales, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02067
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brody Blaze Taylor appearing for Defendant. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 22, 2020. (jas)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Attorney Brody Blaze Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2164165) by Happy Trailer Sales, LLC. (Taylor, Brody)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 Second MOTION for Entry of Default by Court as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. (Henry, Mark)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Entry of Default by Court as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Order of Default, setting hearing for damages)(Henry, Mark)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC. (lw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Court as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Acceptance Service via email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request help to avoid run-around on service, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 4 request for acceptance of service, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1st Process Server confirmation, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2nd Process Server communications, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2nd Process Server Declaration)(Henry, Mark)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Court as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. (Henry, Mark)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Court as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. (Henry, Mark)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint + Summons, filed by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. Happy Trailer Sales, LLC served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Henry, Mark)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A TRADEMARK ACTION for a case initiated by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC with the filing of #2 Complaint,. (Henry, Mark)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Happy Trailer Sales, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Henry, Mark)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2129529), filed by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Federal Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2 - Actual Notice of federal registration)(Henry, Mark)
April 27, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Trademark action: Please complete AO Form 120 found on the U.S Courts website https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 5/18/2020. (hnc)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC v. Happy Trailer Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Trails Trailer Sales, LLC
Represented By: Mark M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy Trailer Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?