Blackburn v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Blackburn
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, United Technologies Corporation and Liberty Mutual Insurance
Case Number: 2:2020cv02068
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth. Stipulated Record is due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 24, 2020. (jas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Mathisen, Eric)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for the Liberty Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to June 29, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 26, 2020. (rjs)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Mathisen, Eric)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Mathisen, Eric)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Kelly Blackburn. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bryant, Glen)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Kelly Blackburn. Liberty Mutual Insurance served on 5/11/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bryant, Glen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Insurance, United Technologies Corporation and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lincoln Financial Group for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Bryant, Glen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Life and Accident Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Bryant, Glen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to United Technologies Corporation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Bryant, Glen)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2130282), filed by Kelly Blackburn.(Bryant, Glen) Modified docket text on 4/28/2020 (mfr).
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Kelly Blackburn. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Blackburn
Represented By: Glen E. Bryant, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?