Francis v. Hamby et al
Plaintiff: Luke Bradley Francis
Defendant: Steven Creek, Rob Schibbelhut, Bentonville Police Department, Fort Smith Police Department, Van Buren Police Department, Mike Hamby, Andrew Arnoldi, Leslie Rutledge, Wesley Roe, Kelsey M. Mahan, Jason Beeler, Dewey Young, Detective Bradley Marion, Don Cassidy and Rosalinda Marrufo
Case Number: 2:2020cv02073
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss Party, #14 Motion to Dismiss Case, and #12 Motion for a More Definite Statement. An #24 amended complaint has been filed, and the motion for a more definite statement is terminated as moot without prejudice to the refiling of a similar motion in response to the amended complaint. See In re Atlas Van Lines, Inc., 209 F.3d 1064, 1067 (8th Cir. 2000) ("It is well-established that an amended complaint supercedes an original complaint and renders the original complaint without legal effect."). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 24, 2020. (rjs) Modified on 6/24/2020 to add document number (rjs).
June 24, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #2 Complaint, against Jason Beeler, Steven Creek, Wesley Roe, Rob Schibbelhut, Kelsey M. Mahan, Rosalinda Marrufo, Fort Smith Police Department, Van Buren Police Department, Andrew Arnoldi, Dewey Young, Bradley Marion, Don Cassidy, filed by Luke Bradley Francis. Related document: #2 Complaint, filed by Luke Bradley Francis.(hnc)
June 19, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Bradley Francis. Andrew Arnoldi served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020; Don Cassidy served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020; Rob Schibbelhut served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (mjm)
June 16, 2020 Set Deadline: Amended Complaint due by 6/29/2020, per 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER. (mjm)
June 16, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss Party MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Leslie Rutledge. (Morrison, Kesia)
June 16, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Party , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Leslie Rutledge. (Morrison, Kesia)
June 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kesia Morrison on behalf of Leslie Rutledge. (Morrison, Kesia)
June 16, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff may amend his complaint at this time as a matter of right under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B) and should do so by filing his amended complaint by June 29, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 16, 2020. (rab)
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint, by Luke Bradley Francis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(lw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Bradley Francis. Steven Creek served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Fort Smith Police Department served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Mike Hamby served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Kelsey M. Mahan served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020; Bradley Marion served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Rosalinda Marrufo served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Wesley Roe served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Van Buren Police Department served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020; Dewey Young served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (lw)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Bradley Francis. Leslie Rutledge served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (lw)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Mike Hamby. (Allison, Derick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Mike Hamby. (Allison, Derick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION for a More Definite Statement by Andrew Arnoldi, Jason Beeler, Don Cassidy, Steven Creek, Kelsey M. Mahan, Bradley Marion, Rosalinda Marrufo, Wesley Roe, Rob Schibbelhut, Dewey Young. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for a More Definite Statement by Andrew Arnoldi, Jason Beeler, Don Cassidy, Steven Creek, Kelsey M. Mahan, Bradley Marion, Rosalinda Marrufo, Wesley Roe, Rob Schibbelhut, Dewey Young. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Denise Gibson on behalf of Andrew Arnoldi, Jason Beeler, Don Cassidy, Steven Creek, Kelsey M. Mahan, Bradley Marion, Rosalinda Marrufo, Wesley Roe, Rob Schibbelhut, Dewey Young. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Andrew Arnoldi, Jason Beeler, Bentonville Police Department, Don Cassidy, Steven Creek, Fort Smith Police Department, Mike Hamby, Kelsey M. Mahan, Bradley Marion, Rosalinda Marrufo, Wesley Roe, Leslie Rutledge, Rob Schibbelhut, Van Buren Police Department, Dewey Young and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #9 Order Directing Service, #2 Complaint, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Andrew Arnoldi, Jason Beeler, Bentonville Police Department, Don Cassidy, Steven Creek, Fort Smith Police Department, Mike Hamby, Kelsey M. Mahan, Bradley Marion, Rosalinda Marrufo, Wesley Roe, Leslie Rutledge, Rob Schibbelhut, Van Buren Police Department, Dewey Young and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 18, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mjm)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #7 Motion for Service. Service will be by separate Order.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 18, 2020. (klk)
May 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #7 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Luke Bradley Francis. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Luke Bradley Francis. (hnc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With his complaint, Plaintiff submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application. However, the application is incomplete because the date of Plaintiff's signature is not provided. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either return the completed application to this court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 50.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 400.00 dollars. It is Plaintiff's responsibility to provide the Court with addresses for proper service on Defendants. See Lee v. Armontrout, 991 F.2d 487, 489 (8th Cir. 1993). Plaintiff is directed to provide service addresses for all Defendants. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 400.00 dollar filing fee or provide the service information by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 5/27/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on May 6, 2020. (klk)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF FACT by Luke Bradley Francis filed by Luke Bradley Francis. (mjm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
May 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Luke Bradley Francis. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(mjm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Luke Bradley Francis. (mjm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Andrew Arnoldi, Jason Beeler, Bentonville Police Department, Don Cassidy, Steven Creek, Fort Smith Police Department, Mike Hamby, Kelsey M. Mahan, Bradley Marion, Rosalinda Marrufo, Wesley Roe, Leslie Rutledge, Rob Schibbelhut, Van Buren Police Department, Dewey Young, filed by Luke Bradley Francis.(mjm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Luke Bradley Francis. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Hamby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Schibbelhut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentonville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Arnoldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey M. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Beeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Bradley Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalinda Marrufo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Bradley Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?