Dooley v. Dillard's, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lucy J. Dooley
Defendant: Dillard's, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02086
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 JUDGMENT; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties are to submit this dispute to arbitration consistent with the terms of their arbitration agreement. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 1, 2020. (mjm)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER granting #6 Motion to Compel arbitration. The parties are ORDERED to submit this dispute to arbitration consistent with the terms of their arbitration agreement. Dooley's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 1, 2020. (mjm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Dillard's, Inc.. (Kolb, Cynthia)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendant is directed to immediately file the reply attached as an exhibit to the motion for leave. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 5, 2020. (rjs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Dillard's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kolb, Cynthia)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 Response to Motion by Lucy J. Dooley. (Carson, Douglas)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration filed by Lucy J. Dooley. (Carson, Douglas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dillard's, Inc.. (Buckley, Mary)
May 18, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2143741.. (Kolb, Cynthia)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Dillard's, Inc.. (Buckley, Mary)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Dillard's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Elec Arb 2016-04-12, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - N. Coley declaration)(Buckley, Mary)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia W. Kolb on behalf of Dillard's, Inc.. (Kolb, Cynthia)
May 18, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/20/2020 (hnc)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dillard's, Inc., filed by Lucy J. Dooley. Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas on 2/4/20.(hnc)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Dillard's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Case opening information) (hnc)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, case number CV-20-141(VII)., filed by Dillard's, Inc..(hnc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings) (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley v. Dillard's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy J. Dooley
Represented By: Douglas M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Buckley
Represented By: Cynthia W. Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?