Tyler v. Metcalf et al
Plaintiff: Cleitus Tyler
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc. and John Allen Metcalf
Case Number: 2:2020cv02129
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 24, 2020. (jas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Knight Transportation, Inc., John Allen Metcalf. (Comstock, Christy)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knight Transportation, Inc..(Comstock, Christy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/4/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 29, 2020. (jas)
July 29, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2188495.. (Comstock, Christy)
July 29, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiff Cleitus Tyler to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for defendant Knight Transportation, Inc., who have already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant(s) to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) (hnc)
July 29, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020 (hnc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by John Allen Metcalf.(hnc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Knight Transportation, Inc., John Allen Metcalf, filed by Cleitus Tyler. Originally filed in the Sebastian County Circuit Court on 6/15/20.(hnc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Allen Metcalf. (hnc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, case number CV-20-479., filed by John Allen Metcalf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Metcalf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleitus Tyler
Represented By: Phillip L. Votaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Allen Metcalf
Represented By: Ezra Jeremiah Smith
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?