Middleton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Teigan Middleton
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2020cv02146
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Mark E. Ford per filing of #8 Consent to assignment. Judge P.K. Holmes no longer assigned. (mjm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Teigan Middleton. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Hamby, Michael)
September 4, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (mjm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 21, 2020. (cla)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Carolyn Colvin; Duane Kees; Eric Holder for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Hamby, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Teigan Middleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hamby, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Teigan Middleton. (Hamby, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Teigan Middleton. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teigan Middleton
Represented By: Michael Hamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?