Logan v. Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC et al
Plaintiff: Glicenia C. Logan
Defendant: Natasha R. Graf, Steve Hotz, Matthew W. Lindsey, Joyce Bradley Babin, Judge P.K. Holmes, Lee Kuykendall, Arvest Bank, Michael J. McKleroy, Jr., Bank of America Corporation, Deputy Prosecutor Alison Houston, First National Bank and Trust of Fort Smith, Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC, Countywide Home Loans, Chris Waters, Bank of NewYork Mellon Corp, Joe F Atkinson, JR., J.P. Sellers, Tax Assessor Zach Johnson, Emily J. Reynolds, Judge James Cox, Dianna Ladd, John Rainwater, Chief Judge Ben T. Barry, Shellpoint Mortage Servicing, Michael Hamby, Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., Armstrong Bank, Kevin Park, Regions Bank, Ray Martinez, Zach Johnson and Alison Houston
Case Number: 2:2021cv02063
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #24 #27 #32 #34 #36 #38 #5 #8 #11 #13 #18 #20 Motions to Dismiss and denying #22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Case is Dismissed Without Prejudice. Ms. Glicenia C. Logan is hereby subject to a Filing Restriction. (see order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2021. (src)
April 27, 2021 Filing 41 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Plaintiff's Answer to the Court and All 27 Defendants filed by Arvest Bank. (Wisley, P.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Plaintiff's Answer to the Court and All 27 Defendants filed by Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC. (Lyons, Jim)
April 20, 2021 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., Emily J. Reynolds, J.P. Sellers. (Cronenwett, Mark)
April 20, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., Emily J. Reynolds, J.P. Sellers. (Cronenwett, Mark)
April 16, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss of Separate Defendants Arvest Bank and Roger Holroyd by Arvest Bank. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons to Sky Rise Real Estate #2 Exhibit 2 - Agents for Service, #3 Exhibit 3 Affidavit of Roger Holroyd) (tg). Modified on 4/16/2021
April 16, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss of Separate Defendants Arvest Bank and Roger Holroyd by Arvest Bank. (Wisley, P.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by P.K. Holmes. (Stone, Lloyd)
April 16, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by P.K. Holmes. (Stone, Lloyd)
April 16, 2021 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ben T. Barry. (Taylor, Candace)
April 16, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ben T. Barry. (Taylor, Candace)
April 16, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd Vance Stone on behalf of P.K. Holmes. (Stone, Lloyd)
April 16, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace L. Taylor on behalf of Ben T. Barry. (Taylor, Candace)
April 15, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Regions Bank re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Brunson, Matt)
April 15, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Hamby. (Hamby, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Hamby. (Hamby, Michael)
April 14, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regions Bank. (Brunson, Matt)
April 14, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Regions Bank. (Brunson, Matt)
April 14, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Regions Bank. (Brunson, Matt)
April 13, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glicenia C. Logan. Alison Houston served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021; Zach Johnson served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; J.P. Sellers served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (lw)
April 13, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO THE COURT AND ALL 27 DEFENDANT'S by Glicenia C. Logan. (Attachments: #1 Summons unexecuted)(lw)
April 12, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Lee Kuykendall. (Reynolds, Bill)
April 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lee Kuykendall. (Reynolds, Bill)
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Cox, Alison Houston, Dianna Ladd. (France, Vincent)
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Cox, Alison Houston, Dianna Ladd. (France, Vincent)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Perry France on behalf of James Cox, Alison Houston, Dianna Ladd. (France, Vincent)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Glicenia C. Logan. Armstrong Bank served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021; Bank of NewYork Mellon Corp served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021; Ben T. Barry served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; James Cox served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Natasha R. Graf served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Michael Hamby served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021; P.K. Holmes served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Steve Hotz served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Alison Houston served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Zach Johnson served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021; Lee Kuykendall served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Matthew W. Lindsey served on 3/27/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Ray Martinez served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021; John Rainwater served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Regions Bank served on 3/25/2021, answer due 4/15/2021; Emily J. Reynolds served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(lw)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Turner Coleman on behalf of Joyce Bradley Babin, Natasha R. Graf. (Coleman, Charles)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Joyce Bradley Babin, Natasha R. Graf. (Cox, Laura)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Joyce Bradley Babin, Natasha R. Graf. (Cox, Laura)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and MOTION to Strike #2 Complaint,, by Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC. (Lyons, Jim)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and, MOTION to Strike #2 Complaint,, by Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC. (Lyons, Jim)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, subject to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be granted and subject to Motion to Strike Pleadings by Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC.(Lyons, Jim)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Steve Hotz, Zach Johnson. (Owens, Jason)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Steve Hotz, Zach Johnson. (Owens, Jason)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Moll on behalf of Armstrong Bank. (Moll, Mark)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Armstrong Bank. (Person, J. Dalton)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Armstrong Bank. (Person, J. Dalton)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached:. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Armstrong Bank, Arvest Bank, Joe F Atkinson, JR., Joyce Bradley Babin, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of NewYork Mellon Corp, Ben T. Barry, Countywide Home Loans, James Cox, First National Bank and Trust of Fort Smith, Natasha R. Graf, Michael Hamby, P.K. Holmes, Steve Hotz, Alison Houston, Zach Johnson, Lee Kuykendall, Dianna Ladd, Matthew W. Lindsey, Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C., Michael J. McKleroy, Jr., Kevin Park, John Rainwater, Regions Bank, Emily J. Reynolds, J.P. Sellers, Shellpoint Mortage Servicing, Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC, Chris Waters ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 2023203), filed by Glicenia C. Logan. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(jlm)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Glicenia C. Logan. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha R. Graf
Represented By: Charles Turner Coleman
Represented By: Laura E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hotz
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Bradley Babin
Represented By: Charles Turner Coleman
Represented By: Laura E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge P.K. Holmes
Represented By: Lloyd Vance Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Kuykendall
Represented By: Bill D. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank
Represented By: P. Joshua Wisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. McKleroy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Prosecutor Alison Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank and Trust of Fort Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Rise Real Estate Fund LLC
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countywide Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of NewYork Mellon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe F Atkinson, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Sellers
Represented By: Mark D. Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Assessor Zach Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily J. Reynolds
Represented By: Mark D. Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge James Cox
Represented By: Vincent Perry France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Ladd
Represented By: Vincent Perry France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Judge Ben T. Barry
Represented By: Candace L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hamby
Represented By: Michael Hamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C.
Represented By: Mark D. Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Bank
Represented By: Mark A. Moll
Represented By: J. Dalton Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Matt L. Brunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Johnson
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Houston
Represented By: Vincent Perry France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glicenia C. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?