Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02153
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/22/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 15, 2021. (jas)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Jones, Jamie)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***DISREGARD, Attorney to refile with correct pleading*** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint against Auto-Owners Insurance Company First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Jones, Jamie) Modified on 11/12/2021 to disregard (mjm).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to November 12, 2021. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 15, 2021. (mer)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Jones, Jamie)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Amended Complaint, filed by Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. Auto-Owners Insurance Company served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Milligan, Phillip)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Milligan, Phillip)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint against Auto-Owners Insurance Company , filed by Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Milligan, Phillip)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER; Plaintiff is allowed to amend its #1 Complaint to cure the defective jurisdictional allegations. Document due in Response to Order by 10/5/2021 as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 28, 2021. (lw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Thrash on behalf of Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Thrash, Thomas)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas Crowder on behalf of Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Crowder, William)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Thomas Thrash and Will Crowder. (cnn)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (lw)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(lw)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/27/2021 (lw)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2465188.. (Milligan, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason's Automotive Collision Center, LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Milligan
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?