Parnell Consultants, Incorporated v. Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Parnell Consultants, Incorporated
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp. and Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02173
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC. (Baker, James)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 15, 2021. (jas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC. (Baker, James)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Parnell Consultants, Incorporated Request for Jury Trial (Tacker, Sarah)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 25, 2021. (jas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC. (Baker, James)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp.. (Baker, James)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC re #2 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Notice of Removal (Baker, James)
October 21, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal, #5 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2481286.. (Baker, James)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by supplementing the notice of removal by 10/27/2021, with adequate allegations demonstrating diversity of citizenship. Further directed to file the disclosure statements required by Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by 10/27/2021. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 20, 2021. (lw)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC.(Baker, James)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC, filed by Parnell Consultants, Incorporated. (Filed in the Circuit Court of Logan County, Arkansas, 9/21/2021.)(lw)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 *** DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY SEE DOCUMENT #1 ***CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC. (lw) Modified on 10/19/2021 to add text(lw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Logan County, Arkansas, case number 42BCV-21-00079, filed by Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC, Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Pleadings)(lw)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC. (lw)
October 19, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (lw)
October 19, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/21/2021.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parnell Consultants, Incorporated v. Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parnell Consultants, Incorporated
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Samuel McLelland
Represented By: Sarah Tacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp.
Represented By: James C. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Service Company, LLC
Represented By: James C. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?