Piel v. Runion et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan I. Piel
Defendant: Sheriff Hobe Runion, Captain Dumas, Eddie Smith, Nurse Morgan and Nurse Elle
Case Number: 2:2021cv02210
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. On December 28, 2021, the Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint and a completed IFP application by January 25, 2022. (ECF No. 3). On January 12, 2022, the order was returned to the Court as undeliverable. That same day the Court mailed the order to Plaintiff at his new address of record. To date, Plaintiff has not filed an Amended Complaint or completed IFP application with the Court. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2022. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on February 7, 2022. (mlf)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Not Deliverable as addressed. Mail originally sent to Jonathan Piel at ADC - Ouachita River Unit, P. O. Box 1630 Malvern, AR 72104 including #3 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint, Order Directing Pleading to be Filed, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) filed by Jonathan I. Piel, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Jonathan I. Piel. Resent to ADC - ESTER UNIT, 7500 Correction Circle, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. (mjm)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address for Jonathan Piel. Documents that have previously been mailed are being resent including, a docket sheet, #3 Order Provisionally Filing Complaint, 1983 Prisoner Litigation Guide, a Blank IFP Application and a Set of 42 USC 1983 forms. (mjm)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Further, ORDER DIRECTING that an Completed IFP be filed. (Amended Complaint due by 1/25/2022 and Completed IFP due by 1/25/2022). Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 28, 2021. (mjm)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Jonathan I. Piel. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(mjm)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Dumas, Elle, Morgan, Hobe Runion, Eddie Smith, filed by Jonathan I. Piel.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piel v. Runion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan I. Piel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Hobe Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Elle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?