Wolfe v. Johnson County AR et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Wolfe
Defendant: Johnson County AR, Johnson County Sheriff's Department, Sheriff Jimmy Stephens, Deputy Jordan Hawkins and Deputy Christopher Rogers
Case Number: 2:2022cv02048
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 14 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 23, 2022. (jas)
May 19, 2022 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jordan Hawkins, Johnson County AR, Johnson County Sheriff's Department, Christopher Rogers, Jimmy Stephens. (Owens, Jason)
April 20, 2022 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 20, 2022. (jas)
April 19, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jordan Hawkins, Johnson County AR, Johnson County Sheriff's Department, Christopher Rogers, Jimmy Stephens.(Owens, Jason)
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jordan Hawkins, Johnson County AR, Johnson County Sheriff's Department, Christopher Rogers, Jimmy Stephens and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 **DISREGARD** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Gabriel Wolfe and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm) Modified on 3/29/2022 to be reissued (jlm).
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Johnson County Sherriff Jimmy Stephens for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Yarbrough, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Deputy Christopher Rogers for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Yarbrough, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Deputy Jordan Hawkins for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Yarbrough, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Johnson County Sherriff's Department for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Complaint. (Yarbrough, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Johnson County for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Yarbrough, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2566861), filed by Gabriel Wolfe.(Yarbrough, Michael)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gabriel Wolfe. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe v. Johnson County AR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Wolfe
Represented By: Michael Yarbrough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County AR
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jimmy Stephens
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jordan Hawkins
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Christopher Rogers
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?