Casteel v. SSA Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2005cv03015
Filed: March 21, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 13 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Callie Casteel 15 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 7, 2007. (tg)
February 16, 2007 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Callie Casteel. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2007. (jn)
January 23, 2007 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
January 8, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski per motion for attorney fees. (jn)
January 5, 2007 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Callie Casteel. (Rawls, David)
October 5, 2006 12 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding case for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) re: 11 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 5, 2006. cc: ALJ, OHA(tg)
September 14, 2006 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 14, 2006. (tg)
July 13, 2006 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones per 10 order. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 13, 2006. (mfr)
July 13, 2006 10 Featured Case ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 13, 2006. (sh)
July 11, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SUPPLEMENTAL SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
June 19, 2006 9 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and administratively terminating this case re 8 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 19, 2006. cc: ALJ, OHA(tg)
May 25, 2006 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on May 25, 2006. (tg)
July 6, 2005 7 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by defendant SSA Commissioner (mfr)
June 20, 2005 6 SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by plaintiff Callie Casteel (tg)
May 20, 2005 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (jrs)
May 20, 2005 5 ***INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY***Social Security Transcript filed by SSA Commissioner***SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL BRIEF by defendant SSA Commissioner (sh) Modified on 5/18/2006 to note correction of docket entry (jrs).
May 20, 2005 4 ANSWER by defendant SSA Commissioner [1-1] (sh)
April 25, 2005 3 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant U.S. Attorney on 3/30/05, SSA Commissioner on 3/31/05 and U.S. Attorney General on 4/06/05 (tg)
March 21, 2005 2 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Beverly S. Jones directing the clerk's office to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of March 7, 2005(cc: all counsel) (tg)
March 21, 2005 FILING FEE PAID: on 3/21/05 in the amount of $ 250.00, receipt # 68095. (tg)
March 21, 2005 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished to parties. (tg)
March 21, 2005 1 COMPLAINT ( 3 summons(es) issued) (referred to Magistrate Beverly S. Jones ) to be filed nunc pro tunc as of 3/7/2005 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casteel v. SSA Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?