Counterman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2005cv03052
Filed: August 31, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Beverly Stites Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2006 15 USCA JUDGMENT dismissing the appeal as to 11 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene M. Counterman. (jn)
October 31, 2006 14 USCA Scheduling Order as to 11 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene M. Counterman. Case Appealed to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 06-3689. (jn)
October 17, 2006 *** COA BATCH RECEIPT of Notice of Appeal and related supporting documents sent on: Tue Oct 17 13:56:00 CDT 2006 (jn)
October 17, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, NOA Supplement, Judgment and Memorandum Opinion dated 9/13/06 and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 11 Notice of Appeal (jn)
October 17, 2006 13 NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re 11 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene M. Counterman. (jn)
October 17, 2006 12 APPEAL NOTICE to Counsel and Pro Se Parties re 11 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene M. Counterman. (Attachments: # 1 Prehearing Conference Program notice)(jn)
October 17, 2006 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 10 Order by Darlene M. Counterman. (cc via ECF: R. Spencer, M. Webb, C. Hawkins) (jn)
September 13, 2006 10 JUDGMENT re 9 Memorandum Opinion; decision of commissioner is affirmed and civil case dismissed w/prejudice.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/13/06. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
September 13, 2006 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/13/06. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
January 13, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 16, 2005 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief.. (jck, )
November 14, 2005 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/14/2005. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/13/2006. (rw )
November 14, 2005 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
October 24, 2005 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 10/24/05. (ct)
October 14, 2005 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Darlene M. Counterman. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/26/2005, answer due 11/25/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Spencer, Frederick)
August 31, 2005 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
August 31, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER re 2 Application filed by Darlene M. Counterman, 1 Complaint filed by Darlene M. Counterman. Granting the application to proceed ifp and directing the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as 8/29/05. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/31/05. (ct)
August 31, 2005 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Darlene M. Counterman. (ct)
August 31, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Darlene M. Counterman. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/29/05(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Counterman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?