Rips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2005cv03062
Filed: November 18, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $806.23. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2007. (jn)
January 5, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
January 3, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 18, 2006 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Diana M. Rips. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit Counsel# 4 Exhibit A - time before the court & SSA# 5 Exhibit A-1 - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
December 18, 2006 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Diana M. Rips. (Spencer, Frederick)
September 20, 2006 10 JUDGMENT reversing commissioner's decision and remanding for further consideration.***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/20/06. (cc: ALJ & OHA) (ct) Modified on 9/21/2006 to add cc: (jn).
September 20, 2006 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/20/06. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
April 24, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 2, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck, )
February 28, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/30/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/1/2006. (mfr)
February 27, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 30, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on January 30, 2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-government's consent)(djm) Modified on 1/30/2006 to edit docket text (mfr).
January 27, 2006 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Diana M. Rips. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/10/2006, answer due 3/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Spencer, Frederick)
November 18, 2005 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
November 18, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Diana M. Rips, and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 11/14/05. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on November 16, 2005. (jn) Modified on 11/22/2005 to correct signature date (cap).
November 18, 2005 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Diana M. Rips to proceed IFP. (jn)
November 18, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Diana M. Rips. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 11/14/05 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Appeals Council Action)(jn) Modified on 11/18/2005 to add nunc pro tunc (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rips v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?