M.J.L. v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2005cv03067
Filed: December 29, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Beverly Stites Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2006 10 JUDGMENT affirming decision of the Commissioner and dismissing plaintiff's case with prejudice ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on December 13, 2006. (tg)
December 13, 2006 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on December 13, 2006. (tg)
May 15, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 12, 2006 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Michele J. LeBoeuf. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 3/1/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 4, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck, )
April 3, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/3/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/2/2006. (mfr)
April 3, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 1, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 1, 2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-defendant's consent)(djm)
December 29, 2005 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
December 29, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Michele J. LeBoeuf and directing the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 12/19/05 . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/28/05. (ct)
December 29, 2005 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Michele J. LeBoeuf. (ct)
December 29, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Michele J. LeBoeuf. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of December 19, 2005 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.J.L. v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?