Pruitt v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03012
Filed: March 16, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Attorney Fees . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/21/07. (ct)
February 2, 2007 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 24, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (ct)
January 23, 2007 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Linda R. Pruitt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Errata A - time before court & SSA# 5 Exhibit Time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 23, 2007 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Linda R. Pruitt. (Spencer, Frederick)
November 6, 2006 12 JUDGMENT granting 10 Motion to Remand and remanding case to Commissioner for further consideration. cc w/mem opn to ALJ & OH&A. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/6/06. (ct)
November 6, 2006 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/6/06. (ct)
November 3, 2006 10 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 27, 2006 9 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on July 27, 2006. (jck)
July 27, 2006 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
July 25, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/24/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/25/2006. (mfr)
July 25, 2006 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 2, 2006 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 2, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
March 21, 2006 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to 3 Complaint, against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Linda R. Pruitt. Related document: 3 Complaint, filed by Linda R. Pruitt,.(Spencer, Frederick)
March 17, 2006 Summons (4) Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner and returned to attorneyfor service (ct)
March 17, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Linda R. Pruitt and directs clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 3/13/06. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 3/16/06. (ct)
March 16, 2006 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Linda R. Pruitt. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as ot 3/13/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct) (refiled to attach exhibits)
March 16, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Linda R. Pruitt. (ct)
March 16, 2006 1 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - RE-FILED TO ATTACHED EXHIBITS ***COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Linda R. Pruitt. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 3/13/06(ct) Modified on 3/17/2006 to show re-filing (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?