Lawhead v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03019
Filed: April 10, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER for reasons in 9 Memorandum Opinion the decision of Commissioner is affirmed. ***Civil Case Terminated****.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/6/07. cc: OH&A & ALJ(ct)
March 6, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/6/07. cc: ALJ and OH&A(ct)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
September 1, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 11, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on July 11, 2006. (jck)
July 11, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
July 10, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/9/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/8/2006. (rw)
July 10, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 2, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 2, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
April 10, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
April 10, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Gary L. Lawhead and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/6/06. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 4/7/06. (ct)
April 10, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Gary L. Lawhead. (ct)
April 10, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Gary L. Lawhead. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/6/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Unfavorable Decision; # 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct) Modified on 4/13/2006 to add pro tunc text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawhead v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?