Rehm v. Social Security Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03021
Filed: April 25, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 and affirming decision of the Commissioner. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on April 19, 2007. (jn)
March 1, 2007 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Curtis M. Rehm. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on March 1, 2007. (jn)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
August 1, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 7, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Curtis M. Rehm. (Bishop, Donald)
June 9, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on June 9, 2006. (jck)
June 9, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
June 8, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/10/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/7/2006. (rw)
June 8, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 2, 2006 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint, filed by Curtis M. Rehm. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 5/2/2006, answer due 7/3/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit postal receipts of service)(Bishop, Donald)
April 25, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Curtis M. Rehm and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 19, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on April 21, 2006. (tg)
April 25, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Curtis M. Rehm. (tg)
April 25, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
April 25, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Curtis M. Rehm to be filed nunc pro tunc as of April 19, 2006.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehm v. Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?