Berger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03022
Filed: May 2, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2007 13 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of David W. Berger against Social Security Administration Commissioner in amount of $1,657.02 in EAJA fees. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 30, 2007. (ct)
September 26, 2007 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by David W. Berger, Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on September 26, 2007. (ct)
September 10, 2007 11 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 4, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant per motion for attorney fees 9 . (jn)
September 4, 2007 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by David W. Berger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA# 5 Exhibit "A-1" time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
September 4, 2007 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by David W. Berger. (Spencer, Frederick)
June 7, 2007 8 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 ; reversing decision of Commissioner and remanding case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four.. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 6/7/07. cc w/copy of R&R to ALJ & OH&A(ct)
May 18, 2007 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by David W. Berger, Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/18/07. (ct)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. (tg)
November 17, 2006 Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (tg)
November 17, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. (tg)
October 23, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to case. (jrs)
October 6, 2006 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 29, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 29, 2006. (bak)
August 29, 2006 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
August 28, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/27/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/27/2006. (cnn)
August 25, 2006 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 7, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd added. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
May 2, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service (ct)
May 2, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by David W. Berger and directing clerk to file 1 Complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/28/06. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 5/1/06. (ct)
May 2, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff David W. Berger. (ct)
May 2, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by David W. Berger. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/28/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?