Vickers v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03023
Filed: May 4, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and affirming the decision of the Commissioner re 7 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 30, 2007. (tg)
May 14, 2007 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Franklin L. Vickers. Objections to R&R due by 5/31/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on May 14, 2007. (tg)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. (tg)
October 27, 2006 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 23, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to case. (jrs)
September 14, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on September 14, 2006. (bak)
September 14, 2006 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
August 31, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/2/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/30/2006. (mfr)
August 31, 2006 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 7, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd added. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
May 4, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
May 4, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 28, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on May 2, 2006. (tg)
May 4, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Franklin L. Vickers. (tg)
May 4, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Franklin L. Vickers to be filed nunc pro tunc as of April 28, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickers v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?