Cantrell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03027
Filed: May 18, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2007 13 JUDGMENT re 12 Memorandum Opinion,affirming decision of Commissioner and dismissing case w/prej ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/30/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
March 30, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/30/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
September 19, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 7, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Carl L. Cantrell. (Throesch, David)
August 30, 2006 9 Featured Case ORDER re 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Social Security Brief filed by Carl L. Cantrell, Motions terminated: 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Social Security Brief filed by Carl L. Cantrell. Appellant Brief due by 9/8/2006. Appellee Brief due by 10/10/2006.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/30/06. (ct)
August 29, 2006 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Social Security Brief by Carl L. Cantrell. (Throesch, David)
August 1, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 1, 2006. (jck)
August 1, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
August 1, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/31/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/2/2006. (mfr)
August 1, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 12, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 12, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
May 26, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
May 18, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Application filed by Carl L. Cantrell and directing 1 Complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/15/06.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 5/16/06. (ct)
May 18, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Carl L. Cantrell (affidavit signed by Carl L. Cantrell) (ct) Modified on 5/22/2006 to add text (jn).
May 18, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Carl L. Cantrell. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/15/06.(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?