Fanning v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03028
Filed: May 22, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2007 19 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Larry D. Fanning against Social Security Administration in the amount of $1,595.20. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 18, 2007. (tg)
June 26, 2007 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA filed by Larry D. Fanning, 16 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Larry D. Fanning, Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 6/26/07. (ct)
June 25, 2007 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 16 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 14, 2007 MOTIONS 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA REFERRED to Judge James R. Marschewski. (jrs)
June 14, 2007 16 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by Larry D. Fanning. (Bishop, Donald)
June 14, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. (tg)
June 12, 2007 15 AFFIDAVIT filed by Larry D. Fanning Plaintiff's Attorney's Affidavit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attorney's Time Spent on Case)(Bishop, Donald)
June 12, 2007 14 AFFIDAVIT of Larry D. Fanning filed by Larry D. Fanning. (Bishop, Donald)
June 12, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion for EAJA Attorney Fees by Larry D. Fanning. (Bishop, Donald)
June 12, 2007 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA by Larry D. Fanning. (Bishop, Donald)
April 12, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on April 12, 2007. cc: ALJ, OHA(tg)
March 22, 2007 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Larry D. Fanning, Objections to R&R due by 4/9/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/22/07. (ct)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
September 13, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 27, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Larry D. Fanning. (Bishop, Donald)
July 25, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
July 25, 2006 6 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on July 25, 2006. (jck)
July 24, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/23/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/22/2006. (mfr)
July 21, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 10, 2006 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint, filed by Larry D. Fanning. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 5/30/2006, answer due 7/31/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit certified mail return receipts)(Bishop, Donald)
May 22, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
May 22, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Larry D. Fanning and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of May 18, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on May 19, 2006. (tg)
May 22, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Larry D. Fanning. (tg)
May 22, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of May 18, 2006, filed by Larry D. Fanning.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fanning v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?