Smith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 3:2006cv03037
Filed: June 27, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Harrison Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2007 13 Featured Case JUDGMENT (MEMORANDUM ORDER) on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to plaintiff against defendant, Motions terminated: 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Jessie W Smith. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on October 9, 2007. (ct)
August 27, 2007 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 13, 2007 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Jessie W Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit of Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit of Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" - time before the court & SSA# 5 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
August 13, 2007 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Jessie W Smith. (Spencer, Frederick)
May 18, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER reversing decision of commissioner and remanding case to US Agency. . Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/18/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of Memorandum Opinion(ct)
May 18, 2007 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/18/07. (ct)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
December 8, 2006 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 26, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 26, 2006. (gg)
October 25, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (gg)
October 10, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/9/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/11/2006. (cap)
October 4, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 27, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 27, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
July 11, 2006 Case reassigned to Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
June 27, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
June 27, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER directing clerk to file the 1 Complaint nunc pro tunc as of June 21, 2006, and granting the 2 Application to proceed ifp.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 6/2606. (ct)
June 27, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Jessie W Smith. (ct)
June 27, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Jessie W Smith. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/21/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Letter from SSA)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?